DS/UK/173 | Lichtwark; Alfred (1852-1914); Dr. phil. | 1852-1914 |
DS/UK/281 | Oberschulbehörde Hamburg | |
DS/UK/318 | Melle; Werner von (18/10/1853-18/02/1937); Dr. iur. | 18/10/1853-18/02/1937 |
DS/UK/352 | Stettiner; Richard (12/05/1865-15/12/1927); Prof. Dr. phil. | 12/05/1865-15/12/1927 |
DS/UK/513 | Brinckmann; Justus (23/05/1843-08/02/1915) | 23/05/1843-08/02/1915 |
DS/UK/904 | Münzel; Robert (12/09/1859-11/07/1917); Prof. Dr. phil. | 12/09/1859-11/07/1917 |
DS/UK/942 | Schrader; Theodor (1844-13/03/1917); Dr. jur. | 1844-13/03/1917 |